Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2845732

EP2845732 - Sheet-fed printing press and process for orienting magnetic flakes contained in an ink or varnish vehicle applied on a sheet-like substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KBA-NotaSys SA
PO Box 347 55, Avenue du Grey
1000 Lausanne 22 / CH
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Gygi, Mathias
Bodenmattstrasse 164
3185 Schmitten / CH
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Koenig & Bauer AG
- Lizenzen - Patente -
Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/11]Noll, Ronald
c/o STICS Group Sàrl
Chemin Curé-Desclouds 2
PO Box 185
1226 Thônex / CH
Application number, filing date14193754.024.09.2010
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2845732
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2845732
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2845732
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B41F11/02, B41F15/08, B41F15/12, B41F19/00, B41F23/04, B41M3/14, B41M7/00, B05D3/00, B05D3/06, B41F21/08
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Former [2015/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bogendruckmaschine und Verfahren zur Ausrichtung von Magnetspänen in einer Tinte oder einem Lackmedium zum Auftragen auf ein bogenähnliches Substrat[2015/11]
English:Sheet-fed printing press and process for orienting magnetic flakes contained in an ink or varnish vehicle applied on a sheet-like substrate[2015/11]
French:Presse à imprimer sur feuilles et procédé pour orienter des flocons magnétiques contenus dans un véhicule d'encre ou de vernis appliqués sur un substrat de type feuille[2015/11]
Examination procedure13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
12.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2017Fee for grant paid
09.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10179681.1  / EP2433798
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.09.2010
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MK22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE24.09.2017
LU24.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU24.09.2010
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE24.09.2017
LU24.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU24.09.2010
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE24.09.2017
LU24.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE24.09.2017
LU24.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE24.09.2017
LU24.09.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[YDA]WO2008102303  (KBA GIORI SA [CH]; GYGI MATTHIAS [CH]; EITEL JOHANN EMIL [DE]; HERMANN) [YD] 1-6,9-12,14 * figures 1,3,4 * * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 10 * [A] 7,8,13;
 [YDA]WO2004007095  (FLEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [YD] 1-6,9-12,14 * figure 12B * * claims 32,33 * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] , [0078] , [0096] , [0097] * [A] 7,8,13;
 [A]GB1261329  (ULRICH FRANCIS STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 * * page 3, lines 50-54 * * page 3, lines 71-74 *;
 [A]FR1336766  (GIORI GUALTIERO) [A] 1-14 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0873866  (DE LA RUE GIORI SA [CH]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 23-30 *;
 [A]FR2492732  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *
by applicantWO2005000585
 WO2008102303
 EP0723864
 EP0769376
 WO9729912
 WO9734767
 WO03093013
 WO2004096545
 WO2005095109
 WO2005102699
 US4838648
 EP0686675
 WO02073250
 WO03000801
 WO2004007095
 WO2004007096
 WO2005002866
 EP1650042
 WO2008139373