EP2887585 - Method for monitoring a communication between a transmitter entity and a receiver entity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roger, Mireille 467 rue Jean Fils 16600 Ruelle-sur-Touvre / FR | 02 /
Tardivon, Alain 1 rue du Terrasson Dauves 16170 Gourville / FR | [2016/18] |
Former [2015/26] | 01 /
Roger, Mireille 467 rue Jean Fils 16600 Ruelle-sur-Touvre / FR | ||
02 /
Tardivon, Alain 1 rue du Terrasson Dauves 16170 GOURVILLE / FR | Representative(s) | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2016/18] |
Former [2015/26] | Bié, Nicolas, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14194322.5 | 21.11.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | FR20130063168 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1363168 | [2015/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887585 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2887585 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H04L43/103 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/24 (BR);
H04L43/0811 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/06 (BR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Kommunikation zwischen einem Sende- und einem Empfangsgerät | [2015/26] | English: | Method for monitoring a communication between a transmitter entity and a receiver entity | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé de surveillance d'une communication entre un équipement émetteur et un équipement récepteur | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 20.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2014 | AL | 04.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | MT | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.11.2014 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2363548 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, lines 13-15 * * page 5, lines 4-25 *; | [A]US2008165796 (MARTINEZ CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 8] - [0010] - [0 14] - [0018]; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2012174934 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract * |