blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2884350

EP2884350 - ZERO-RESET DEVICE WITH INDEPENDENT HAMMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/25]Zero-reset device with intependent hammers
[2016/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, IS
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société anonyme de la Manufacture d'Horlogerie Audemars Piguet & Cie
16, route de France
1348 Le Brassus / CH
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Philippine, Thibaut
15, Rue du Tercasset
1337 Vallorbe / CH
02 / Gabathuler, Jacques
18, Chemin de la Gradelle
1224 Chêne-Bougeries / CH
03 / Montet, Johan
Route du Crêt-du-Puits 11
1343 Les Charbonnières / CH
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Sammer, Thomas
per Mens Intellectual
Property Consulting Sàrl
Rue Agasse 54
1208 Genève / CH
[2015/25]
Application number, filing date14195738.101.12.2014
[2015/25]
Priority number, dateCH2013000208016.12.2013         Original published format: CH 20802013
[2015/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2884350
Date:17.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2884350
Date:25.05.2016
Language:FR
[2016/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2884350
Date:15.02.2017
Language:FR
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2016
ClassificationIPC:G04F7/08, G04F7/06
[2016/21]
CPC:
G04F7/0809 (EP,US); G04F7/0819 (EP,US); G04F7/062 (EP,US);
G04F7/0814 (US)
Former IPC [2015/25]G04F7/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/32]
Former [2015/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NULLRÜCKSTELLVORRICHTUNG MIT UNABHÄNGIGEN HÄMMERN[2016/44]
English:ZERO-RESET DEVICE WITH INDEPENDENT HAMMERS[2017/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REMISE À ZÉRO AVEC MARTEAUX INDÉPENDANTS[2016/44]
Former [2015/25]Nullrückstellvorrichtung mit unabhängigen Hämmern
Former [2015/25]Zero-reset device with intependent hammers
Former [2015/25]Dispositif de remise à zéro avec marteaux indépendants
Examination procedure29.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/32]
04.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2016Fee for grant paid
30.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2014
AL15.02.2017
AT15.02.2017
CY15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MK15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
TR15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IS15.06.2017
PT15.06.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2020/15]HU01.12.2014
AT15.02.2017
CY15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MK15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
TR15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2019/52]HU01.12.2014
AT15.02.2017
CY15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MK15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2019/47]HU01.12.2014
AT15.02.2017
CY15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU01.12.2014
AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2019/30]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]CH623980  (DUBOIS & DEPRAZ SA [CH]) [A] 1,13,15 * page 4, column l, line 9 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 5, column r, line 27 - page 5, column r, line 27; figures 6,9 *;
 [A]CH146042  (D HORLOGERIE MINERVA S A FAB [CH]) [A] 1,14,15* page 1, column r, line 1 - page 2, column l, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP1890205  (CHOPARD MANUFACTURE SA [CH]) [AD] 1-3 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [AD]EP2241945  (PATEK PHILIPPE SA GENEVE [CH]) [AD] 1-3,8,9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005;0009] - paragraph [0024] *
by applicantEP1890205
 EP2241945
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.