blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2881045

EP2881045 - Adapter direct drive push button retention mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Richard, Paul D.
22 Woodsend Avenue
Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US
02 / Zergiebel, Earl M.
1422 Little Meadow Road
Guilford, Connecticut 06430 / US
03 / Chowaniec, David M.
2580 Main Street
Rocky Hill, Connecticut 06067 / US
04 / Williams, Ryan V.
133 Lake Shore Drive
New Hartford, Connecticut 06057 / US
05 / Subramanian, Anand
189 Seaside Avenue, Unit 4
Stamford, Connecticut 06902 / US
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Soames, Candida Jane
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB
Application number, filing date14196148.203.12.2014
[2015/24]
Priority number, dateUS201361911781P04.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361911781 P
US20141454964321.11.2014         Original published format: US201414549643
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2881045
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/072, // A61B17/00, A61B17/29
[2015/24]
CPC:
A61B17/07207 (EP,US); A61B17/29 (US); A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/295 (US); A61B17/320016 (US); A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US); A61B2017/00473 (US); A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00486 (EP,US); A61B2017/2931 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
Former [2015/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Druckknopfhaltemechanismus für Adapterdirektantrieb[2015/24]
English:Adapter direct drive push button retention mechanism[2015/24]
French:Mécanisme de rétention d'un bouton poussoir d'entraînement direct d'adaptateur[2015/24]
Examination procedure03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
30.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012323226  (CHOWANIEC MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [X]EP2599447  (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0063]; figures 3,6a-6c *;
 [E]EP2815705  (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0039]; figures 14,16,17 *
by applicantWO2009039506
 US2011121049
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.