Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2881715

EP2881715 - Self-calibrating position sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TT Electronics Technology Limited
Harston Mill
Harston
Cambridge CB2 5GG / GB
For all designated states
AB Elektronik GmbH
Feldmark 50
59368 Werne / DE
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Witts, David
TT Electronics Technology Limited
c/o Harston Mill
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 5GG / GB
02 / Ruhl, Stefan
AB Elektronik GmbH
c/o Feldmark 50
59368 Werne / DE
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Spaargaren, Jerome
EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2015/24]
Application number, filing date14196321.504.12.2014
[2015/24]
Priority number, dateGB2013002152905.12.2013         Original published format: GB 201321529
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2881715
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2881715
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01D18/00, G01L25/00, G01D5/20, G01D5/244, G01D5/245, G01L3/10
[2016/26]
Former International [2015/24]G01D18/00, G01L25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2015/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Selbstkalibrierender Positionssensor[2015/24]
English:Self-calibrating position sensor[2015/24]
French:Capteur de position à étalonnage automatique[2015/24]
Examination procedure10.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
08.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2017Fee for grant paid
18.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2014
AT30.08.2017
CY30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MK30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU04.12.2014
AT30.08.2017
CY30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU04.12.2014
AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/40]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO0216188  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,10 * page 5, line 11 - page 9, line 24; figures 1-5 * [A] 8,11,12 [I] 7,9;
 [XA]WO0216881  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,10 * page 8, line 18 - page 13, line 3; figures 4-6 * [A] 8,9,11,12