Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2881513

EP2881513 - Mobile drying rack for drying laundry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas De France
220 rue Gustave Eiffel Z.I. Les Milles
13854 Aix en Provence / FR
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Blouin, Philippe
TEXAS DE FRANCE
625-RD17
13510 Eiguilles / FR
02 / Lancrry, Arnaud
TEXAS DE FRANCE
12, Résidence La Carane
Avenue La Carane
09000 Foix / FR
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date14196666.305.12.2014
[2015/24]
Priority number, dateFR2013006213505.12.2013         Original published format: FR 1362135
[2015/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2881513
Date:10.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2881513
Date:13.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/16
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Former [2015/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reise-Trockenständer zum Wäschetrocknen[2015/24]
English:Mobile drying rack for drying laundry[2015/24]
French:Etendoir ambulant pour le séchage du linge[2015/24]
Examination procedure23.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
01.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.06.2016Fee for grant paid
06.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.12.2014
AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
MT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
TR13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU05.12.2014
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
MT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
TR13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU05.12.2014
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
MT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU05.12.2014
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/45]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008039086  (HEATED CLOTHES RACK COMPANY LT [NZ], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 25 - page 15, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]EP1895042  (SINCERE INTERNAT TRADING CO LT [CN]) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]FR1284588  (M. BERNARD DUCOS DE LA HAILLE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1895042
 WO2008039086
 WO2013107973