Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2880970

EP2880970 - Plant tray, assembly of a tray and at least one plant pot, method for assembling an assembly, and method for handling plant pots [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Houdstermaatschappij Modiform B.V.
Ambachtsweg 15
3831 KA Leusden / NL
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / van Heugten, Petrus Johannes
Ambachtsweg 15
3831 KA Leusden / NL
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/37]
Former [2015/24]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14196999.809.12.2014
[2015/24]
Priority number, dateNL2013201191809.12.2013         Original published format: NL 2011918
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880970
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2880970
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01G9/04
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2015/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Pflanzenschale, Anordnung einer Schale und mindestens eines Pflanztopfs, Verfahren zum Aufbauen einer Anordnung und Verfahren zur Handhabung von Pflanztöpfen[2015/24]
English:Plant tray, assembly of a tray and at least one plant pot, method for assembling an assembly, and method for handling plant pots[2015/24]
French:Plateau à pots de fleur, ensemble d'un plateau et au moins un pot de fleur, procédé d'assemblage d'un ensemble et procédé pour manipuler des pots de fleur[2015/24]
Examination procedure10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
05.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.12.2014
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE09.12.2016
LU09.12.2016
MT09.12.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU09.12.2014
AT14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE09.12.2016
LU09.12.2016
MT09.12.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU09.12.2014
AT14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE09.12.2016
LU09.12.2016
MT09.12.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU09.12.2014
AT14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE09.12.2016
LU09.12.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE09.12.2016
LU09.12.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2499902  (SIERTEELT VERPAKKINGS POOL B V [NL]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0649592  (KANEYA SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US5022183  (BOHLMANN LOTHAR E [CA]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004211118  (SMITH THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *