EP2887704 - Method for interaction between a first digital object and at least one second digital object and interaction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, GR | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78 Rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giraudon, Vincent 311 Chemin des Terriers Les Villas de Flore A1 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Romano, Philippe 4, Cours du 11 Novembre Bâtiment A Résidence Allées du Cours 06800 Cagnes Sur Mer / FR | 03 /
Grohan, Patrick 511, Chemin du Galinier Villa n°7 06140 Vence / FR | 04 /
Bruno, Adrien 17, avenue Jean Cuméro 06130 Grasse / FR | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2020/32] |
Former [2015/26] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14198095.3 | 16.12.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | FR20130063498 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1363498 | [2015/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887704 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2887704 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/021, H04L29/08 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04L67/025 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04L67/125 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04L67/54 (EP);
H04W4/026 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | H04W4/02, H04L29/08, G06F17/30, G06F3/0346, G06F3/01, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Interaktion zwischen einem ersten digitalen Objekt und mindestens einem zweiten digitalen Objekt, und Interaktionssystem | [2015/26] | English: | Method for interaction between a first digital object and at least one second digital object and interaction system | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé d'interaction entre un premier objet numérique et au moins un deuxième objet numérique et système d'interaction | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2014 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | GR | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | IE | 16.12.2020 | LU | 16.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0017737 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-7,9-18 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, line 30 - line 34 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 11 * * page 7, line 26 - line l * * page 8, line 4 - line 20 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 19 * * page 10, line 25 - line 32 * * page 11, lines 7-9,24-30 * * page 12, lines 3-14,30-33 * * page 13, line 16 - line 25 * [I] 8; | [A]US2005225453 (CHANG WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] *; | [X]US2012019674 (OHNISHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0041] * * paragraph [0341] - paragraph [0349] * * paragraph [0357] - paragraph [0358] * * paragraph [0422] - paragraph [0425] * * paragraphs [0512] , [ 520] , [0523] , [ 524] * * paragraphs [0533] , [ 546] , [0583] * * paragraph [0824] - paragraph [0828] * * paragraphs [0835] , [0954] , [0955] * * paragraphs [0969] , [0970] , [0975] * * paragraphs [1095] , [1100] , [1101] * * paragraph [1127] - paragraph [1133] * * paragraph [1164] - paragraph [1168] * * paragraph [1177] - paragraph [1187] * * paragraph [1199] - paragraph [1204] * * paragraphs [1235] , [1239] , [1252] * * paragraph [1266] - paragraph [1276] * * paragraph [1283] - paragraph [1286] * * paragraph [1297] * * paragraph [1362] - paragraph [1366] * * paragraphs [1629] , [1649] , [1686] * * paragraphs [1754] , [1776] , [1802] * * paragraph [1942] - paragraph [1950] *; | [XI]FR2971657 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-18 * page 2, line 10 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6, line 9 - line 20 * * page 7, lines 4,5,12,13 * * page 9, line 5 - line 15 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 17 * * page 13, line 9 - line 20 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 12 * * page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 15 * [I] 8; | [A]US2013085509 (STOKES MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0027] ** paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] *; | [AD]FR2985584 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 3 * * page 8, line 3 - page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 9 * * page 12, line 4 - line 14 * * page 13, lines 4-8,19-25 * | by applicant | FR20120052873 | FR20120062595 |