Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2890094

EP2890094 - Function-level lock for mobile device security [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2018/45]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Hirase, Yoshiya
550 Moreland Way
Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/45]
Former [2015/27]Jenkins, Richard Gavin , et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14198156.316.12.2014
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateUS20131414434730.12.2013         Original published format: US201314144347
KR2014013655110.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140136551
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2890094
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2890094
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/67, H04M1/673, G06F21/83, G06F21/36, H04W12/06, G06F21/32, G06F21/62, H04W12/12
[2018/31]
Former International [2015/27]H04M1/67, H04M1/673, G06F21/83, G06F21/36, H04W12/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:Funktionsebenenschloss für die Sicherheit einer mobilen Vorrichtung[2015/27]
English:Function-level lock for mobile device security[2015/27]
French:Serrure de niveau fonctionnel pour une sécurité de dispositif mobile[2015/27]
Examination procedure16.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/27]
04.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2018Fee for grant paid
26.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
EE07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
MC07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RO07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
SI07.11.2018
SK07.11.2018
SM07.11.2018
IE16.12.2018
LU16.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
EE07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
MC07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RO07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
SK07.11.2018
SM07.11.2018
IE16.12.2018
LU16.12.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
EE07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
MC07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RO07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
SK07.11.2018
SM07.11.2018
LU16.12.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/39]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
EE07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RO07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
SK07.11.2018
SM07.11.2018
LU16.12.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
EE07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RO07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
SM07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
CZ07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
PL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
DK07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
IT07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT07.11.2018
NO07.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2264641  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0102] * * figures 1,2,3B,4-7 * [I] 2-8,10-15;
 [XI]EP1775669  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 3,5-8 * [I] 2-8,10-15