Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2890094


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
20.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.01.2020  [2020/04]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
13.09.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.10.2019  [2019/42]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
05.10.2018 (Expected) grant published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
29.09.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.06.2018 Change - classification published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
29.06.2018 Change - classification published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
21.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2017 Change - representative
12.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
30.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
17.12.2014 Change - representative