Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2957312

EP2957312 - Inhalation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manta Devices, LLC
112 Beech Street
Roslindale MA 02131 / US
[2015/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Andrew
112 Beech Street
Roslindale, MA 02131 / US
02 / Miller, Richard L.
5 North Hill Avenue
Needham, MA 02492 / US
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/52]
Application number, filing date14198194.421.10.2005
[2015/52]
Priority number, dateUS20050700947P20.07.2005         Original published format: US 700947 P
US20050703032P27.07.2005         Original published format: US 703032 P
[2015/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2957312
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2957312
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M11/00, A61M15/00, // A61M11/02
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2015/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Inhaliervorrichtung[2015/52]
English:Inhalation device[2015/52]
French:Dispositif d'inhalation[2015/52]
Examination procedure16.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
21.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2019Fee for grant paid
14.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05812327.4  / EP1917057
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5239993  (EVANS RIX E [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 28; figures 2-4 * [Y] 10;
 [X]US5447151  (BRUNA PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * column 20, line 13 - column 25, line 25; figures 9-14 *;
 [Y]US6810873  (HAIKARAINEN JUSSI [FI], et al) [Y] 10 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 22; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS2590832
 US6722364
 US2004206773
 US6595203
 US6655381
 WO9007351
 US2603216