EP2878675 - Fermentation process using specific oxygen uptake rates as a process control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Hoek, Pim 290 Calle Oro Vista Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | 02 /
Aristidou, Aristos 7909 Kingsview Lane North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 03 /
Rush, Brian 4412 W. Harriet Lake Parkway 101 Minneapolis, MN 554210 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Marro, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2017/29] |
Former [2015/23] | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14198669.5 | 30.05.2003 | [2015/23] | Priority number, date | US20020384333P | 30.05.2002 Original published format: US 384333 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2878675 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2878675 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/56, C12P7/62, C12N1/16, C12N15/81 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C12P7/56 (EP,US);
C12N1/16 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12P7/625 (EP,US);
C12Q1/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fermentationsverfahren mit spezifischen Sauerstoffaufnahmeraten als Prozesskontrolle | [2015/23] | English: | Fermentation process using specific oxygen uptake rates as a process control | [2015/23] | French: | Procédé de fermentation régulé par détermination du taux de consommation en oxygène spécifique | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03756237.8 / EP1513939 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, NL, MC, LU, IT, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 10.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2003 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.05.2003 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | SE | 19.07.2017 | |
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | SE | 19.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4064015 (NYIRI LASZLO K, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 34 - column 8, line 23; figure 1 * * column 11 - column 12; example 4 * * column 14 - column 16; claims 16-19 *; | [A]WO0029604 (UNIV AKRON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [I]WO0240697 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 9; claims 1,2,5 *; | [A] - MARCEL F. FLIKWEERT ET AL, "Metabolic responses of pyruvate decarboxylase-negative Saccharomyces cerevisiae to glucose excess", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199709), vol. 63, no. 9, pages 3399 - 3404, XP055182817 [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * | [A] - MARIA ANTONIETA P. GIMENES ET AL, "Oxygen Uptake Rate in Production of Xylitol by Candida guilliermondii with Different Aeration Rates and Initial Xylose Concentrations", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200204), vol. 98-100, no. 1-9, doi:10.1385/ABAB:98-100:1-9:1049, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 1049 - 1060, XP055178104 [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/ABAB:98-100:1-9:1049 | [A] - U RAU ET AL, "Oxygen controlled batch for enhanced production cultivations of Schizophyllum commune of branched fl-1,3-glucans", BIOPROCESS ENGINEERING, (199409), vol. 11, pages 161 - 165, XP055178622 [A] 1-15 * figures 2-4 * | [A] - WELCH BAILLARGEON, M. ET AL., "EFFECT OF OXYGEN UPTAKE RATE ON ETHANOL PRODUCTION BY A XYLOSE FERMENTING YEAST MUTANT, Candida sp. XF-217", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (1983), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 339 - 344, XP002678182 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 340, line 6 - line 19 * * page 340, line 28 - line 34 * * page 342, line 20 - line 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01141135 | [A] - O'CONNOR G M ET AL, "DESIGN AND EVALUATION OF CONTROL STRATETGIES FOR HIGH CELL DENSITY FERMENTATIONS", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19920205), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:10.1002/BIT.260390307, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 293 - 304, XP000919458 [A] 1-15 * figures 6,7; table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260390307 | [A] - KISHORE D RANE ET AL, "Oxygen Uptake and Citric Acid Production by Candida /i'o/ytica Y 1095", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19940120), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 131 - 137, XP055178205 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | [A] - KONG SIK KIM ET AL, "Control of intracellular ammonium level using specific oxygen uptake rate for overproduction of citric acid by Aspergillus niger", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 79, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0922-338X(95)94747-F, ISSN 0922-338X, pages 555 - 559, XP055178202 [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(95)94747-F | by applicant | US4275234 | US4771001 | US5132456 | US5142023 | WO9300440 | US5338822 | US5420304 | US5510526 | US5641406 | US5831122 | WO0071738 | WO0242471 | - PORRO ET AL., "Development of metabolically engineered Saccharomyces cerevisiae cells for the production of lactic acid", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (199505), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1021/bp00033a009, pages 294 - 8, XP002941414 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp00033a009 | - PORRO ET AL., "Replacement of a metabolic pathway for large-scale production of lactic acid from engineered yeasts", APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIAL., (199909), vol. 65, no. 9, pages 4211 - 5 | - BIANCHI ET AL., "Efficient homolactic fermentation by Kluyveromyces lactis strains defective in pyruvate utilization and transformed with the heterologous LDH gene", APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (200112), vol. 67, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.67.12.5621-5625.2001, pages 5621 - 5, XP002236026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.12.5621-5625.2001 | - T.B. VICKROY, Comprehensive Biotechnology, PERGAMON, (1985), vol. 3 | - R. DATTA ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (1995), vol. 16, pages 221 - 231 | - PORRO ET AL., "Development of metabolically engineered Saccharomyces cerevisiae cells for the production of lactic acid", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., vol. 11, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1021/bp00033a009, pages 294 - 8, XP002941414 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp00033a009 | - PORRO ET AL., "Replacement of a metabolic pathway for large-scale production of lactic acid from engineered yeasts", APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (199909), vol. 65, no. 9, pages 4211 - 5 | WO2002US16223 |