Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3034576

EP3034576 - PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE FOR OUTDOOR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/25]Pressure sensitive adhesive for outdoor applications
[2019/07]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2016/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Eckhardt, Doreen
Bruderschaftsweg 6
41542 Dormagen / DE
02 / Goeb, Siegfried
Eschenweg 7
47877 Willich / DE
03 / Waid, Robert
3M Center
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / Reimann, Stefan
Anton-Ockenfels-Str. 49
50321 Bruehl / DE
05 / Kempf, Michael
Königsstraße 10a
41460 Neuss / DE
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[2016/25]
Application number, filing date14198948.318.12.2014
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3034576
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3034576
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09J133/08, C09J133/10, C09J133/06, C08K5/00
[2019/04]
Former International [2016/25]C09J133/08, C09J133/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Former [2016/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DRUCKEMPFINDLICHER KLEBSTOFF FÜR AUSSENANWENDUNGEN[2019/07]
English:PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE FOR OUTDOOR APPLICATIONS[2019/07]
French:ADHÉSIF SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION POUR APPLICATIONS EXTÉRIEURES[2019/07]
Former [2016/25]Druckempfindlicher Klebstoff für Außenanwendungen
Former [2016/25]Pressure sensitive adhesive for outdoor applications
Former [2016/25]Adhésif sensible à la pression pour applications extérieures
Examination procedure18.12.2014Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/19]
19.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
24.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2019Fee for grant paid
13.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
24.03.2017Request for further processing filed
24.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
24.03.2017Request for further processing filed
24.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
24.03.2017Request for further processing filed
24.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
[2020/07]
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2010104864  (ZOELLNER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0 89] , [0 90] , [ 252] , [ 265]; example MT5 *;
 [X]US2014057091  (KRAWINKEL THORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 65] , [0000] , [0 84] , [ 230] - paragraph [0233]; examples VT1, VT2; table 3 *;
 [X]EP2746356  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0 63] , [0 68] , [0 75] , [0 76] , [ 113] - paragraph [0115] *
by applicantUS2003157337
 DE202009013255U
 EP2305389
 EP2414143
 EP2192148
 EP2186869
 EP0752435
 EP1802722
 EP1791921
 EP1791922
 EP1978069
 DE102008059050
 US2013190459
 US2013190460