Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899768

EP2899768 - Organic light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.06.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Display Co., Ltd.
128 Yeoui-daero
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Se Hee
109-103, Haesolmaeul 1(il)-danji Doosan Weve Apt.
Mokdong-dong
413-110 Paju-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14199699.122.12.2014
[2015/31]
Priority number, dateKR2013016898631.12.2013         Original published format: KR 20130168986
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899768
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/50, H01L27/32, H01L51/52
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2015/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Organische lichtemittierende Vorrichtung[2015/31]
English:Organic light emitting device[2015/31]
French:Dispositif électroluminescent organique[2015/31]
Examination procedure22.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/31]
28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012012820  (ENDO JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,12 * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0186]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0255] - paragraph [0275]; figure 5 * [I] 5,6,8,10,11;
 [Y]JP2007059124  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0077]; figure 8 *;
 [Y]US2005242712  (SUNG CHAO-CHIN [TW]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2A,2C *;
 [Y]US2010052527  (IKEDA KAORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0070]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0117]; figure 7 *;
 [Y]US2009091255  (LEE SUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2013240851  (SEO HIROMI [JP], et al) [Y] 8,10,11 * figure 7 *