blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2889827

EP2889827 - Automatic electronic method for executing financial stock trading orders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2018  [2018/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Banca Akros SPA
Viale Eginardo 29
20149 Milano / IT
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / GRILLI, TULLIO
VIALE EGINARDO, 29
I-20149 MILANO / IT
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Vitillo, Giuseppe
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
[2015/27]
Application number, filing date14199864.122.12.2014
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateIT2013TO0107830.12.2013         Original published format: IT TO20131078
[2015/27]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2889827
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:G06Q40/04
[2015/27]
CPC:
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Former [2015/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Automatisches elektronische Verfahren zum ausführen von Handelsaufträgen[2015/27]
English:Automatic electronic method for executing financial stock trading orders[2015/27]
French:Procédé automatique électronique pour l'éxecution d'ordres de bourse[2015/27]
Examination procedure28.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/51]
06.08.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2018
13.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/51]
08.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
08.04.2016Request for further processing filed
08.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.04.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.