Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858396

EP2858396 - BROADCAST CHANNEL IN MULTICARRIER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/15]Broadcast channel in multicarrier systems
[2017/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications LLC
1701 John F. Kennedy Blvd.
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[2015/41]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Ofinno Technologies, LLC
13633 Cedar Run Lane
Herndon, VA 20171 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dinan, Esmael Hejazi
13633 Cedar Run Lane
VA, 20171 Herndon / US
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Werinherstrasse 79
81541 München / DE
[2018/08]
Former [2015/15]Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14200113.003.07.2012
[2015/15]
Priority number, dateUS201161504257P04.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161504257 P
US201161523135P12.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161523135 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2858396
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2858396
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2858396
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/02
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
Former [2015/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:RUNDFUNKKANAL IN MEHRTRÄGERSYSTEMEN[2017/38]
English:BROADCAST CHANNEL IN MULTICARRIER SYSTEMS[2017/38]
French:CANAL DE DIFFUSION DANS DES SYSTÈMES À PORTEUSES MULTIPLES[2017/38]
Former [2015/15]Rundfunkkanal in Mehrträgersystemen
Former [2015/15]Broadcast channel in multicarrier systems
Former [2015/15]Canal de diffusion dans des systèmes à porteuses multiples
Examination procedure18.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/13]
30.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2018Fee for grant paid
02.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12741415.9  / EP2564612
Divisional application(s)EP18157643.0  / EP3346743
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE03.07.2018
LU03.07.2018
MT03.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE03.07.2018
LU03.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE03.07.2018
LU03.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE03.07.2018
LU03.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
LU03.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011149894  (LUO TAO [US], et al) [A] 1,3,12,14 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0092]; figures 5-7 *