blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2888963

EP2888963 - Atomizer and electronic cigarette having same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd.
Tangwei Industry Park
Nº 1 Jian'an Road
Fuyong Street
Baoan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518104 / CN
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Yonghai
Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd.
Tangwei Industry Park
No.1 Jian'an Road
Fuyong Street, Baoan District
518104 Shenzhen / CN
02 / Xu, Zhongli
Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd.
Tangwei Industry Park
No.1 Jian'an Road
Fuyong Street, Baoan District
518104 Shenzhen / CN
03 / He, Youlin
Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd.
Tangwei Industry Park
No.1 Jian'an Road
Fuyong Street, Baoan District
518104 Shenzhen / CN
04 / Hu, Shuyun
Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd.
Tangwei Industry Park
No.1 Jian'an Road
Fuyong Street, Baoan District
518104 Shenzhen / CN
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH
Obermattweg 12
6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH
[2019/08]
Former [2015/27]ProI European Patent Attorneys
Postfach 2123
90711 Fürth / DE
Application number, filing date14200363.129.12.2014
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateCN201320883181U31.12.2013         Original published format: CN 201320883181 U
CN201420266716U23.05.2014         Original published format: CN 201420266716 U
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888963
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2888963
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:H05B3/48, A24F47/00
[2018/40]
CPC:
A24F40/46 (EP,US); A24F40/44 (EP,US); H05B3/48 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US); A24F40/485 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2015/27]A24F47/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:Zerstäuber und elektronische Zigarette damit[2015/27]
English:Atomizer and electronic cigarette having same[2015/27]
French:Dispositif d'atomisation et cigarette électronique comportant celui-ci[2015/27]
Examination procedure30.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/27]
01.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2018Fee for grant paid
17.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2014
AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CY20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
MK20.02.2019
MT20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU29.12.2014
AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CY20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
MT20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2021/33]HU29.12.2014
AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CY20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2021/26]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CY20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2020/39]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
MC20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2020/17]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
TR20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2020/13]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SI20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2020/03]AL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/52]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2404515  (HON LIK [CN]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2013152922  (BENASSAYAG CHARLY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0023] *;
 [A]US2013160765  (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *;
 [X]WO2013113173  (MAAS BERNARD KAREL [CN]) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013220315  (CONLEY GREGORY D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.