Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2913988

EP2913988 - Housing, electronic device using same, and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Futaihong Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Section F3-A, Foxconn Technology Industry Zone Longhua Town, Baoan District
Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province 518109 / CN
For all designated states
FIH (Hong Kong) Limited
8/F., Peninsula Tower 538 Castle Peak Road Cheung Sha Wan Kowloon
Hong Kong / HK
[2015/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Gu, Chang-Hai
Section F3-A, Foxconn Technology Industry Zone
LongHua Town
BaoAn District
518109 Shenzhen City / CN
02 / Liu, Xiao-Kai
Section F3-A, Foxconn Technology Industry Zone
LongHua Town
BaoAn District
518109 Shenzhen City / CN
03 / Qin, Yao-Yao
Section F3-A, Foxconn Technology Industry Zone
LongHua Town
BaoAn District
518109 Shenzhen City / CN
 [2015/36]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/36]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date14200698.031.12.2014
[2015/36]
Priority number, dateCN2014106554526.02.2014         Original published format: CN201410065545
[2015/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2913988
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/02, H05K5/02
[2015/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2015/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Gehäuse, elektronische Vorrichtung damit und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon[2015/36]
English:Housing, electronic device using same, and method for making same[2015/36]
French:Boîtier, dispositif électronique l'utilisant et son procédé de fabrication[2015/36]
Examination procedure29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/14]
01.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011076582  (LITE ON MOBILE OYJ [FI]; BLOM CARL-GUSTAF [SE]; HEDLUND THOMAS [SE]; B) [X] 1,6,10,12,14,15 * figures 1,2,5 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, paragraph 12 * * page 17, line 27 - page 19, line 9 * [I] 2-5,7-9,11,13;
 [XI]EP2498336  (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1,6,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * [I] 2-5,7-9,11,13;
 [A]EP2670116  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *