blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2889218

EP2889218 - Cooling systems for high mach applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU, MK
published on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Corporation
450 South Meridian Street
Indianapolis, Indiana 46225-1103 / US
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Vaisman, Igor
13931 Amblewind Place
Carmel, IN 46074 / US
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)HGF
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/46]HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
Former [2015/27]HGF Limited
Belgrave Hall
Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date14200712.931.12.2014
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateUS201361921864P30.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361921864 P
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2889218
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2889218
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:B64D13/06
[2015/27]
CPC:
B64D13/06 (EP,US); F02C7/16 (US); F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B11/04 (EP,US); F25B49/02 (EP,US); F25B2309/005 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US); F25B2400/0411 (EP,US); F25B2400/14 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2501 (EP,US); F25B40/00 (EP,US); F25B6/04 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US); Y02T50/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Former [2015/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlsysteme für Überschallanwendungen[2015/27]
English:Cooling systems for high mach applications[2015/27]
French:Systèmes de refroidissement pour des régimes supersoniques[2015/27]
Examination procedure31.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/07]
08.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2018Fee for grant paid
04.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.12.2014
AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CY14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
MK14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
TR14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
MT31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
GB14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
[2020/31]
Former [2020/17]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
TR14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
MT31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
GB14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2020/11]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
MT31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
GB14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2020/08]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
MT31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2020/04]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/50]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BE31.12.2018
IE31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/48]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
IE31.12.2018
LU31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/39]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU31.12.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE1153632  (NORMALAIR LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 16; figure - * [A] 3-7,10-14;
 [A]US4434624  (CRONIN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *;
 [IA]EP1927816  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [I] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0060]; figure - * [A] 3,5,10,12,15;
 [XA]EP2272757  (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,6,7,10,11,13-15
ExaminationWO2014158280
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.