Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778922

EP2778922 - Method and system for enabling data sharing between software systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thoughtwire Holdings Corp.
207 Adelaide Street East Suite 300
Toronto, Ontario M5A 1M8 / CA
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Owens, Stephen Paul
207 Adelaide Street East
Suite 300
Toronto, Ontario M5A1M8 / CA
02 / Monteith, Michael Lorne
207 Adelaide Street East
Suite 300
Toronto, Ontario M5A1M8 / CA
03 / Nunes, Jose Humberto Terra
207 Adelaide Street East
Suite 300
Toronto, Ontario M5A1M8 / CA
04 / Faria, David Ferreira
207 Adelaide Street East
Suite 300
Toronto, Ontario M5A1M8 / CA
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Bridle, Andrew Barry
Bridle Intellectual Property Ltd
Unit 6F Thomas Way
Lake View Business Park
Sturry Road, Canterbury
Kent CT3 4JZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date14275068.614.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131380416814.03.2013         Original published format: US201313804168
US20131396764315.08.2013         Original published format: US201313967643
US20141416521727.01.2014         Original published format: US201414165217
US20141416526127.01.2014         Original published format: US201414165261
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2778922
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2778922
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/52, // G06F19/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Ermöglichung der gemeinsamen Nutzung von Daten zwischen Softwaresystemen[2014/38]
English:Method and system for enabling data sharing between software systems[2014/38]
French:Procédé et système pour permettre le partage de données entre des systèmes logiciels[2014/38]
Examination procedure29.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
23.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011209138  (MONTEITH MICHAEL LORNE [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007022107  (YUAN JUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] *
by applicantUS2012310900