blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2778922 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2778922



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 781
17.09.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2019 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
30.08.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.04.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
01.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
29.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.10.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 12
20.05.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 168
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 138
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 148
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 119
17.04.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 3
14.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2014 Description Search / examination 72
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 40
14.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5