blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2778922


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.03.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.07.2018 First examination report
27.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2015 Change - designated states published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
06.11.2015 Change - request for examination published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
03.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
15.10.2015 Change - representative
27.03.2015 Publication of search report published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
17.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
12.09.2014 Change - inventor published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]