blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2778922
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014281909Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014280496Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10313433Global Dossier 04.06.2019B2
US2014280845 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9742843Global Dossier 22.08.2017B2
US2014280535 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2817334Global Dossier 19.02.2019C
CA2817334 14.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2778922Global Dossier 29.04.2015A3
EP2778922 17.09.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2845695 14.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2845733 14.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2845932 14.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2514459 26.11.2014A
GB201404638D 30.04.2014D0
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2514460 26.11.2014A
GB201404643D 30.04.2014D0
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2514654 03.12.2014A
GB201404645D 30.04.2014D0
Priority number Date
US201313967643 15.08.2013
US201414165217 27.01.2014
US201414165261 27.01.2014
US201313804168 14.03.2013