Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2947265

EP2947265 - Optical and electrical sensing of a multiphase fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint-Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:FR  GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG The Hague / NL
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Moise, Stefan Iulian
c/o Etudes et Productions Schlumberger, 1 rue
Henri Becquerel
92140 Clamart / FR
02 / Amsellem, Olivier
c/o Etudes et Productions Schlumberger, 1 rue
Henri Becquerel
92140 Clamart / FR
03 / Vigneaux, Pierre
c/o Etudes et Productions Schlumberger, 1 rue
Henri Becquerel
92140 Clamart / FR
04 / Stephan Rivas, Caroline
c/o Etudes et Productions Schlumberger, 1 rue
Henri Becquerel
92140 Clamart / FR
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Rzaniak, Martin
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger
1, rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14290149.520.05.2014
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2947265
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/10, G01N27/07, G01F1/74
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
Former [2015/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optische und elektrische Messvorrichtungen für mehrphasige Flüssigkeit[2015/48]
English:Optical and electrical sensing of a multiphase fluid[2015/48]
French:Détection optique et électrique d'un fluide multiphase[2015/48]
Examination procedure25.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5088324  (NEMETH FRANK A [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [I] 11-15;
 [XI]US2013258319  (SCHLEICHER ECKART [DE], et al) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0013] , [0022] , [0027] , [0028] , [0037] * [I] 8-10