Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897418

EP2897418 - Advertising storage capabilities accessible via a wireless local area network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Vigoureux, Martin
Alcatel-Lucent Bell Labs France
Route de Villejust
91620 NOZAY / FR
02 / Le Pallec, Michel
Alcatel-Lucent Bell Labs France
Route de Villejust
91620 NOZAY / FR
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Berthier, Karine , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/22]Berthier, Karine , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
148/152, route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2015/30]Sciaux, Edmond
Alcatel-Lucent International
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Application number, filing date14305073.020.01.2014
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897418
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2897418
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/08
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2015/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bekanntgabe von über ein drahtloses lokales Netzwerk zugänglichen Speicherkapazitäten[2015/30]
English:Advertising storage capabilities accessible via a wireless local area network[2015/30]
French:Annoncer des capacités de stockage accessibles via un réseau local sans fil[2015/30]
Examination procedure22.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/09]
09.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2016Fee for grant paid
22.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2016
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.01.2014
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU20.01.2014
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2019/39]HU20.01.2014
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2019/31]HU20.01.2014
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/46]AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE20.01.2017
LU20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
LU20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1530325  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]; MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]EP2046084  (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]WO2006000617  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; SINIVAARA HASSE [FI]; BLACK SIMON [GB]; EDNEY JONATHA) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 9 *;
 [A]US2013237192  (KIM SUHWOOK [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] *