Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899689

EP2899689 - Method for inpainting a target area in a target video [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Newson, Alasdair
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS 17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
02 / Almansa, Andres
c/o Télécom ParisTech
46 rue Barrault
75634 Paris Cedex 13 / FR
03 / Fradet, Matthieu
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS 17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
04 / Gousseau, Yann
c/o Télécom ParisTech
46 rue Barrault
75634 Paris Cedex 13 / FR
05 / Perez, Patrick
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS 17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14305096.123.01.2014
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899689
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren für Inpainting eines Zielbereichs in einem Zielvideo[2015/31]
English:Method for inpainting a target area in a target video[2015/31]
French:Procédé pour la retouche d'une zone cible dans une vidéo cible[2015/31]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
08.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]  - AARTI S DESHMUKH ET AL, "Image inpainting using multiresolution wavelet transform analysis", COMMUNICATION, INFORMATION&COMPUTING TECHNOLOGY (ICCICT), 2012 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121019), doi:10.1109/ICCICT.2012.6398156, ISBN 978-1-4577-2077-2, pages 1 - 6, XP032294126 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 6, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCICT.2012.6398156
 [A]  - ALASDAIR NEWSON ET AL, "Towards fast, generic video inpainting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON VISUAL MEDIA PRODUCTION, CVMP '13, New York, New York, USA, (20130101), doi:10.1145/2534008.2534019, ISBN 978-1-45-032589-9, pages 1 - 8, XP055117708 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2534008.2534019