Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819478

EP2819478 - A method for allocating radio resources, and a base station and a user terminal therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Braun, Volker
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Cesar, Bozo
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Kleinbub, Oliver , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstr. 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date14305251.224.02.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateEP2013030590127.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13305901
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819478
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04L5/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ressourcenzuweisungsverfahren, Basistation und Endgerät[2015/01]
English:A method for allocating radio resources, and a base station and a user terminal therefor[2015/01]
French:Procédé, station de base et terminal d'utilisateur pour l'attribution de ressources[2015/01]
Examination procedure30.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/17]
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012041363  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]; BUCKNELL PAUL [GB]; LI ZHAOJUN [GB]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13,15-17 * page 2, line 32 - page 19, line 33; figures 1-12 *;
 [XY]WO2012087693  (INTEL CORP [US]; HIMAYAT NAGEEN [US]; JOHNSSON KERSTIN [US]; TALWAR SH) [X] 1-10,13,16,17 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 30; figures 2-5 * * page 9, line 15 - page 11, line 31; figures 7C,8 * [Y] 11,14;
 [Y]US2007171808  (WU JIANMING [CA] ET AL) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048]; figure 8 *;
 [A]WO2013009346  (INTEL CORP [US]; HUANG RUI [CN]; LI HONGGANG [CN]; MOHANTY SHANTIDEV [) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102487548  (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [X]  - SHAO-YU LIEN ET AL, "Toward ubiquitous massive accesses in 3GPP machine-to-machine communications", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20110401), vol. 49, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2011.5741148, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 66 - 74, XP011478245 [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,13,16,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2011.5741148
 [YA]  - MARTIN BEALE, "Future challenges in efficiently supporting M2M in the LTE standards", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE WORKSHOPS (WCNCW), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120401), doi:10.1109/WCNCW.2012.6215486, ISBN 978-1-4673-0681-2, pages 186 - 190, XP032185780 [Y] 14 * page 189; figure 2 * [A] 1-13,15-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNCW.2012.6215486