Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953343

EP2953343 - Method for sorting and homogenizing a group of images, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.12.2016  [2016/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Sabater, Neus
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
02 / Hellier, Pierre
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
03 / Demoulin, Vincent
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14305837.803.06.2014
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2953343
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/62, G06F17/30
[2015/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Sortieren und Homogenisieren einer Gruppe von Bildern, entsprechende Vorrichtung, Computerprogramm und übergangsloses computerlesbares Medium[2015/50]
English:Method for sorting and homogenizing a group of images, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium[2015/50]
French:Procédé de tri et d'homogénéisation d'un groupe d'images, dispositif correspondant, programme informatique et support lisible par ordinateur non transitoire[2015/50]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/50]
18.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1231777  (GRETAG IMAGING TRADING AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2013016837  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]; LIU KEYAN [CN]; SUN XINYUN [CN];) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1640914  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH [GB]; MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5930783  (LI WEN-SYAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - NEEL JOSHI ET AL, "Personal photo enhancement using example images", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (20100301), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1145/1731047.1731050, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 15, XP055152246 [Y] 1-15 * figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1731047.1731050
 [Y]  - LYNDON KENNEDY ET AL, "How flickr helps us make sense of the world", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA , MULTIMEDIA '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1291233.1291384, ISBN 978-1-59-593702-5, page 631, XP055152251 [Y] 1-15 * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1291233.1291384
 [A]  - THOMAS DESELAERS ET AL, "Features for image retrieval: an experimental comparison", INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, (20071129), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s10791-007-9039-3, ISSN 1386-4564, pages 77 - 107, XP055151695 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10791-007-9039-3
 [A]  - PIERRE-ALAIN MOËLLIC ET AL, "Image clustering based on a shared nearest neighbors approach for tagged collections", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2008 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTENT-BASED IMAGE AND VIDEO RETRIEVAL, CIVR '08, New York, New York, USA, (20080101), doi:10.1145/1386352.1386390, ISBN 978-1-60-558070-8, page 269, XP055056653 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1386352.1386390
by applicant   - Y. RUBNER, "The Earth Mover's Distance as a Metric for Image Retrieval", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2000), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1023/a:1026543900054, pages 99 - 121, XP007910189

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/a:1026543900054
    - S-H. CHA, "Taxonomy of Nominal Type Histogram Distance Measures", AMERICAN CONFERENCE ON APPLIED MATHEMATICS (MATH'08, (20080324), pages 325 - 330
    - B. GEORGESCU, "Mean Shift Based Clustering in High Dimensions: A Texture Classification Example", NINTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (20031013), vol. 1, page 456463
    - Y. CHENG, "Mean shift, mode seeking, and clustering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (199508), vol. 17, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/34.400568, pages 790 - 799, XP000527671

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.400568
    - Y. BOYKOV; V. KOLMOGOROV, "An Experimental Comparison of Min-Cut/Max-Flow Algorithms for Energy Minimization in Vision", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE (PAMI, (200409), vol. 26, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60, pages 1124 - 1137, XP011115612

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60
    - E. REINHARD, "Color Transfer between Images", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, (200109), vol. 21, no. 5, XP002728545

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.946629
    - F. PITIE, "N-Dimensional Probability Density Function Transfer and its Application to Color Transfer", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (2005), vol. 2, pages 1434 - 1439, XP002728546