EP3001415 - Method and apparatus for determining whether a specific watermark symbol out of one or more candidate watermark symbols is embedded in a current section of a received audio signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Michael Eichendorffstr. 1b 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 02 /
Baum, Peter Georg Aschendorfer Str. 25 30539 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Chen, Xiaoming Vahrenwalderstr. 101 30165 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Gries, Ulrich Friedenauer Str. 20b 30419 Hannover / DE | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 14306464.0 | 23.09.2014 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001415 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/018 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G10L19/018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung, ob ein bestimmtes Wasserzeichensymbol aus einem oder mehreren Kandidatenwasserzeichensymbolen in einem gegenwärtigen Abschnitt eines empfangenen Audiosignals eingebettet ist | [2016/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining whether a specific watermark symbol out of one or more candidate watermark symbols is embedded in a current section of a received audio signal | [2016/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant de déterminer si un symbole en filigrane spécifique à partir d'un ou de plusieurs symboles de filigranes candidats est incorporé dans une section présente d'un signal audio reçu | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2387033 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]EP2175443 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A] - MICHAEL ARNOLD ET AL, "Robust detection of audio watermarks after acoustic path transmission", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH ACM WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA AND SECURITY, MM&SEC '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1854229.1854253, ISBN 978-1-45-030286-9, page 117, XP055071121 [A] 1-8 * section 4.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1854229.1854253 | by applicant | WO2011141292 | - M. ARNOLD; X.M. CHEN; P. BAUM; U. GRIES; G. DOERR, "A phase-based audio watermarking system robust to acoustic path propagation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, (201403), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TIFS.2013.2293952, pages 411 - 425, XP011538857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIFS.2013.2293952 | - R.E. CAFLISCH, "Monte Carlo and quasi-Monte Carlo methods", ACTA NUMERICA, (199801), vol. 7, pages 1 - 49 | WO2014EP66063 |