Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3016066

EP3016066 - Method for processing a video sequence, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2017  [2017/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Boitard, Ronan
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
02 / Thoreau, Dominique
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
03 / Bouatouch, Kadi
c/o IRISA
263 Avenue du Général Leclerc
35042 RENNES / FR
04 / Cozot, Remi
c/o IRISA
263 Avenue du Général Leclerc
35042 RENNES / FR
05 / Gruson, Adrien
c/o IRISA
263 Avenue du Général Leclerc
35042 RENNES / FR
06 / Touze, David
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs
CS17616
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR
 [2016/18]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14306741.130.10.2014
[2016/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3016066
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/40, G06T5/00, G06T5/50
[2016/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer Videosequenz, zugehörige Vorrichtung, Computerprogramm und übergangsloses computerlesbares Medium[2016/18]
English:Method for processing a video sequence, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium[2016/18]
French:Procédé de traitement d'une séquence vidéo, dispositif correspondant, programme informatique et support lisible par ordinateur non transitoire[2016/18]
Examination procedure05.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/18]
13.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006177150  (UYTTENDAELE MATTHEW T [US] ET AL) [X] 1,10-12 * abstract * [I] 2-4;
 [X]  - Ronan Boitard, "Temporal Coherency in Video Tone Mapping - PhD thesis", Université de Rennes 1, (20141016), URL: http://people.irisa.fr/Ronan.Boitard/articles/2014/Ronan_Boitard_PhD_Manuscript.pdf, (20150114), XP055161983 [X] 1,5-7,10,12 * Section 4.2;; figure 3 *
 [XDI]  - BOITARD R. ET AL., "Zonal Brightness Coherency for video tone mapping", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (201402), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 229 - 246, XP002734607 [XD] 1,10-12 * figures 11,12 * [I] 8,9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.IMAGE.2013.10.001
 [A]  - JOSSELIN PETIT ET AL, "A high dynamic range rendering pipeline for interactive applications; In search for perceptual realism", THE VISUAL COMPUTER ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER GRAPHICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100408), vol. 26, no. 6-8, ISSN 1432-2315, pages 533 - 542, XP019845802 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004014081
    - REINHARD E. ET AL., "Photographic tone reproduction for digital images", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (200207), vol. 21, pages 267 - 276
    - KANG S. B. ET AL., "High dynamic range video", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, PROCEEDING OF ACM SIGGRAPH, (200307), vol. 22, no. 33, pages 319 - 325
    - RAMSEY S. ET AL., "Adaptive temporal tone mapping", COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND IMAGING, (2004), pages 3 - 7
    - MANTIUK R., "Display adaptive tone mapping", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (200808), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1145/1399504.1360667, page 1, XP055043632

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1399504.1360667
    - BOITARD R. ET AL., "Temporal coherency for video tone mapping", PROC. SPIE CONFERENCE SERIES, VOLUME 8499 OF SPIE CONFERENCE SERIES, (2012), vol. 8499, doi:doi:10.1117/12.929600, XP055116195

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.929600
    - BOITARD R. ET AL., "Zonal Brightness Coherency for video tone mapping", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (201402), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 229 - 246
    - KRUTZ A., "Rate-Distortion Optimized Video Coding Using Automatic Sprites", IEEE SELECTED TOPICS IN SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20110825), vol. 5, no. 7
    - DRAGO F. ET AL., "Adaptive Logarithmic Mapping For Displaying High Contrast Scenes", COMPUTER GRAPHICS FORUM
    - GUTHIER G. ET AL., "Flicker Reduction in Tone Mapped High dynamic Range Video", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE COLOR IMAGING XVI: DISPLAYING, PROCESSING, HARDCOPY, AND APPLICATIONS, (201101), vol. 7866, doi:doi:10.1117/12.872449, XP055061689

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.872449