Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3023938 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3023938



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 78
19.04.2017 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
04.01.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.05.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
01.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.10.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
06.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 7
04.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.12.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
21.11.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
21.11.2014 Description Search / examination 15
21.11.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
21.11.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5