Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3023938


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.04.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
09.01.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.01.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
25.05.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
28.04.2016 Change - representative
05.12.2014 Change - representative