Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3023938

EP3023938 - Method and apparatus for tracking the motion of image content in a video frames sequence using sub-pixel resolution motion estimation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.05.2017  [2017/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Hepper, Dietmar
Wernigeroder Weg 41
30419 Hannover / DE
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/21]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date14306853.421.11.2014
[2016/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3023938
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/20
[2016/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verfolgung der Bewegung von Bildinhalt in einer Videorahmensequenz mit Subpixelauflösungsbewegungsschätzung[2016/21]
English:Method and apparatus for tracking the motion of image content in a video frames sequence using sub-pixel resolution motion estimation[2016/21]
French:Procédé et appareil pour suivre le mouvement de contenu d'image dans une séquence de trames vidéo utilisant une estimation de mouvement de résolution sous-pixel[2016/21]
Examination procedure26.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/21]
10.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2381418  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0011] - [0015] *;
 [A]US6104439  (JEONG JECHANG [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, paragraph 40 *;
 [A]US2013076915  (RAMACHANDRAN MAHESH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] *