Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3035721

EP3035721 - Resource sharing between devices in a wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/38]
Former [2018/16]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Mathur, Akhil
Alcatel-Lucent Ireland Ltd
Blanchardstown Business Tech Park
Snugborough Road
Blanchardstown
DUBLIN, 15 / IE
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2018/38]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site de Nokia Paris-Saclay
Route des Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
Former [2016/25]Mills, Julia , et al
Script IP Limited
18 Bridge Street
Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB
Application number, filing date14307035.715.12.2014
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3035721
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3035721
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/18, H04L29/08, H04W4/00, H04W8/00
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
Former [2016/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gemeinsame Nutzung von Ressourcen zwischen Vorrichtungen in einem drahtlosen Netz[2016/25]
English:Resource sharing between devices in a wireless network[2016/25]
French:Partage de ressources entre des dispositifs dans un réseau sans fil[2016/25]
Examination procedure15.12.2014Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
15.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2018Fee for grant paid
09.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU15.12.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU15.12.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012131364  (GROMAT HERVE [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0061]; figures 5-6 * * paragraphs [0127] - [0133]; claims 1-7 * [I] 4,5,12;
 [X]US2014044007  (SMADI MOHAMMED NAWAF [CA]) [X] 1,7,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0070] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraphs [0095] - [0096] * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [A]US2008192666  (KOSKAN PATRICK D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 4-12 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] *