Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3035765

EP3035765 - A method for a random access procedure, and a base station and a device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2016/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Doetsch, Uwe
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Braun, Volker
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Kleinbub, Oliver , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstr. 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/25]
Application number, filing date14307068.818.12.2014
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3035765
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, // H04W74/00, H04W56/00
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren für eine Direktzugriffsprozedur und Basisstation und Vorrichtung dafür[2016/25]
English:A method for a random access procedure, and a base station and a device therefor[2016/25]
French:Procédé pour une procédure d'accès aléatoire, station de base et dispositif associé[2016/25]
Examination procedure23.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/26]
01.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2381726  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0012] - [0024] - [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0035] , [0073] - [0084] - [0091] - [0105] - [0107] *;
 [A]US2009268666  (VUJCIC DRAGAN [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013288698  (RUNE JOHAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - MONOWAR HASAN ET AL, "Random access for machine-to-machine communication in LTE-advanced networks: issues and approaches", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20130601), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2013.6525600, ISSN 0163-6804, XP011514638 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2013.6525600