Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3035234

EP3035234 - Method and electronic device for object tracking in a light-field capture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2017  [2017/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Le Clerc, Francois
5, rue Alain Gerbault
35590 L'Hermitage / FR
02 / Robert, Philippe
30 rue Armand Barbès
35000 Rennes / FR
03 / Varanasi, Kiran
9 Square Docteur Guérin
35000 Rennes / FR
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date14307073.818.12.2014
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3035234
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G06T7/20
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und elektronische Vorrichtung zur Objektverfolgung in einer Lichtfelderfassung[2016/25]
English:Method and electronic device for object tracking in a light-field capture[2016/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif électronique pour le suivi d'objets dans une capture de champ lumineux[2016/25]
Examination procedure23.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/25]
30.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/25]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009092282  (AVIDAN SHMUEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0041] * [Y] 6,9 [I] 11;
 [A]FR2912239  (THOMSON LICENSING SAS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 1 - line 31 *
 [Y]  - GHASEMI ALIREZA ET AL, "Scale-invariant representation of light field images for object recognition and tracking", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20130312), vol. 9020, doi:10.1117/12.2041105, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-62841-432-5, pages 902015 - 902015, XP060035744 [Y] 6,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2041105
 [A]  - YANG TAO ET AL, "Occluded object imaging via optimal camera selection", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20131219), vol. 9067, doi:10.1117/12.2049680, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-62841-432-5, pages 906703 - 906703, XP060032464 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2049680
by applicant   - Z. KALAL ET AL., "Tracking-Learning-Detection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2012), vol. 34, pages 1409 - 1422
    - S. HARE ET AL., "Struck: Structured Output Tracking with Kernels", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV, (2011), pages 263 - 270
    - A. SMEULDERS ET AL., "Visual Tracking: an Experimental Survey", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2013), vol. 36, pages 1442 - 1468
    - T. TUYTELAARS ET AL., "Local Invariant Feature Detectors: a Survey", FOUNDATIONS AND TRENDS IN COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND VISION, (2008), vol. 3, pages 177 - 28