blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3034609

EP3034609 - Recombinant swinepox virus and vaccines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2017  [2017/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ceva Santé Animale
10 Avenue de La Ballastière
33500 Libourne Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Ceva Sante Animale
10 Avenue de La Ballastière
33500 Libourne Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Takanori
Muraoka-higashi 4-6-10
Fujisawa-shi
Kanagawa, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Becker, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25 Rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]Becker, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date14307110.819.12.2014
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3034609
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/863, A61K39/275, A61K39/00
[2016/25]
CPC:
C12N15/86 (EP,RU,US); A61K39/12 (EP,US); A61P31/14 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (US); A61K2039/552 (EP,US); C12N2710/24043 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24071 (EP,US); C12N2750/10034 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rekombinanter Schweinepockenvirus und Impfstoffe[2016/25]
English:Recombinant swinepox virus and vaccines[2016/25]
French:Virus de recombinaison de la variole porcine et vaccins[2016/25]
Examination procedure23.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/25]
01.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/25]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5651972  (MOYER RICHARD W [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 40; figure 1; claims 1-17; sequences 1, 9, 45 *;
 [A]US6127163  (COCHRAN MARK D [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 9; examples 1-24; claims 1-48 *;
 [A]  - HUI-XING LIN ET AL, "A novel vaccine against Porcine circovirus type 2 (PCV2) and Streptococcus equi ssp. zooepidemicus (SEZ) co-infection", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, (20140601), vol. 171, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.vetmic.2014.03.018, ISSN 0378-1135, pages 198 - 205, XP055196101 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 199 - page 204; figures 1-7; tables 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetmic.2014.03.018
 [A]  - HUI-XING LIN ET AL, "Construction and immunogenicity of recombinant swinepox virus expressing capsid protein of PCV2", VACCINE, (20120901), vol. 30, no. 44, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2012.07.082, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 6307 - 6313, XP055129546 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 6308 - page 6312; figures 1-4; tables 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2012.07.082
 [A]  - JIARONG XU ET AL, "Immune responses and protection efficacy of a recombinant swinepox virus expressing HA1 against swine H3N2 influenza virus in mice and pigs", VIRUS RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 167, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2012.04.014, ISSN 0168-1702, (20120427), pages 188 - 195, (20120511), XP028425736 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 188 - page 194; figures 1-7; tables 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2012.04.014
 [A]  - JIARONG XU ET AL, "Immune responses and protective efficacy of a recombinant swinepox virus expressing HA1 against swine H1N1 influenza virus in mice and pigs", VACCINE, (20120401), vol. 30, no. 20, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2012.02.028, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3119 - 3125, XP055196476 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3120 - page 3124; figures 1-7; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2012.02.028
 [A]  - HUI-XING LIN ET AL, "A novel vaccine againstssp.infections: The recombinant swinepox virus expressing M-like protein", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 29, no. 40, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2011.07.074, ISSN 0264-410X, (20110708), pages 7027 - 7034, (20110720), XP028283454 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 7028 - page 7033; figures 1-6; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.07.074
 [A]  - WINSLOW B J ET AL, "Feline B7.1 and B7.2 proteins produced from swinepox virus vectors are natively processed and biologically active: Potential for use as nonchemical adjuvants", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 111, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1135, (20051130), pages 1 - 13, (20051130), XP027620479 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1 - page 11; figures 1-5 *
 [A]  - TRIPATHY D N, "SWINEPOX VIRUS AS A VACCINE VECTOR FOR SWINE PATHOGENS", ADVANCES IN VETERINARY MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19990101), vol. 41, ISSN 1093-975X, pages 463 - 480, XP000995212 [A] 1-16 * page 469 - page 477; figure 1 *
 [A]  - BARCENA J ET AL, "Recombinant Swinepox Virus Expressing beta-Galactosidase: Investigation of Viral Host Range and Gene Expression Levels in Cell Culture", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980410), vol. 243, no. 2, doi:10.1006/VIRO.1998.9053, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 396 - 405, XP004445896 [A] 1-16 * page 397 - page 404; figures 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1998.9053
 [A]  - LEEK VAN DER M L ET AL, "EVALUATION OF SWINEPOX VIRUS AS A VACCINE VECTOR IN PIGS USING AN AUJESZKY'S DISEASE (PSEUDORABIES) VIRUS GENE INSERT CODING FOR GLYCOPROTEINS GP50 AND GP63", VETERINARY RECORD, BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (19940101), vol. 134, no. 1, ISSN 0042-4900, pages 13 - 18, XP000995125 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 13 - page 17 *
 [A]  - FOLEY P L ET AL, "SWINEPOX VIRUS AS A VECTOR FOR THE DELIVERY OF IMMUNOGENS", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19910101), vol. 646, doi:10.1111/J.1749-6632.1991.TB18581.X, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 220 - 222, XP002917502 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1991.tb18581.x
 [T]  - C. L. AFONSO ET AL, "The Genome of Swinepox Virus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20020115), vol. 76, no. 2, doi:10.1128/JVI.76.2.783-790.2002, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 783 - 790, XP055196377 [T] * abstract * * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.2.783-790.2002
by applicantUS5387519
 US5651972
 EP1036180
 EP1741785
 EP1816200
 WO2010061000
 EP2225367
 WO2013030320
 WO2014167060
    - OGAWA R. ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 486 - 490
    - HSU, K. H. ET AL., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, pages 607 - 612
    - SHIN, M. -F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, pages 5867 - 5870
    - VAN ZIJL M. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2761 - 2765
    - MORGAN R. W. ET AL., AVIAN DIS., (1992), vol. 36, pages 858 - 870
    - DAVISON A. J. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 210, no. 4, pages 749 - 69
    - BERTHOLET ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, pages 2096 - 2100
    - WEIR J. P.; MOSS B., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 75 - 80
    - ROSS L. J., GEN. VIROL., (1993), vol. 74, pages 371 - 377
    - ALTING-MESS M. A., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 9494
    - GUNNING P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 4931 - 4835
    - KOST A. T., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, pages 8287 - 8301
    - SPITZNER J. R., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 1 - 11
    - FIEK A. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 1785
    - NEEDLEMAN, S. B.; WUNSCH, CD., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.