blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2859915 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2859915



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 86
17.03.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
20.04.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.02.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
28.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 Description Search / examination 11
09.10.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
09.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Priority document Search / examination 17
09.10.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
09.10.2014 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 17