blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2859915
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2859915Global Dossier 15.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
PL40560213 10.10.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL227190B 30.11.2017B1
PL405602 13.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
PL40560213 10.10.2013