Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2859915

EP2859915 - Device for blood photobiomodulation during the extracorporeal circulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wojewodzki Szpital Specjalistyczny we Wroclawiu
ul. Kamienskiego 73
51-124 Wroclaw / PL
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Walski, Tomasz
ul. Korczaka 4/8
46-040 Ozimek / PL
02 / Komorowska, Malgorzata
ul. Promien 27/8
51-659 Wroclaw / PL
03 / Grzeszczuk-Kuc, Karolina
ul. Krucza 98/9
53-412 Wroclaw / PL
04 / Galecka, Katarzyna
ul. Zeromskiego 28/14
50-321 Wroclaw / PL
05 / Oleszko, Adam
ul. Rzeszowska 30/5
45-286 Opole / PL
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Winohradnik, J. Halina
Wojewodzki Szpital Specjalistyczny
we Wroclawiu
ul. H. Kamienskiego 73
51-124 Wroclaw / PL
[2015/16]
Application number, filing date14460065.709.10.2014
[2015/16]
Priority number, datePL2013040560210.10.2013         Original published format: PL 40560213
[2015/16]
Filing languagePL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2859915
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06, A61M1/32, A61M1/36, A61M1/16
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für die Photobiomodulation während der extrakorporalen Zirkulation[2015/16]
English:Device for blood photobiomodulation during the extracorporeal circulation[2015/16]
French:Dispositif de photobiomodulation sanguine pendant la circulation extracorporelle[2015/16]
Examination procedure09.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
16.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/16]
30.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/16]
Documents cited:Search[I]DE29520218U  (SEBASTIAN RUDOLF DR MED [DE]) [I] 1-8,11,14 * page 1, paragraph l * * figure 1 *;
 [XI]US6144444  (HAWORTH WILLIAM S [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13,15,16 * column 2, line 10 - line 13 * * column 2, line 41 - line 44 * * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * column 6, line 4 - line 27 * * column 7, line 10 - line 40 * * column 8, line 5 - line 16 * * figures 1,3A,4 * [I] 5,6,14;
 [I]EP0361999  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-16 * column 3, line l - column 4, line 41 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 10 * * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [AD]US8133195  (BLICKE RAINER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 53 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2013101464  (SMYCZYNSKI MARK S [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 20 - line 6, paragraph 22 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - paragraph 26 * * page 3, column 1, line 5 - paragraph 36 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]US7527737  (WANG XIANGYU [CN]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 59 * * column 6, line 18 - line 23 * * figure 1 *
by applicantUS2934067
 US5043140
 US8133195
 US2309124
 EP1689450
 US4692138
 US4612007
 US4321918
 US4576143
 US4950225
 US5104373
 US7527737
 US8535361
 EP2179767
 WO9916308
    - ITOH T; MURAKAMI H; ORIHASHI K.; SUEDA T; KUSUMOTO Y; KAKEHASHI M; MATSUURA Y, "Low power laser protects human erythrocytes In an In vitro model of artificial heart-lung machines", ARTIF ORGANS, (2000), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 870 - 3,