Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3108178

EP3108178 - LED SOCKET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Nederland B.V.
Rietveldenweg 32
5222 AR's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / POORTER, Peter
Vroonhoeve , 47
NL-4261 LD Wijk en Aalburg / NL
02 / IEDEMA, Jeroen
Azalea straat 19
NL-8471 KA Wolvega / NL
03 / LEIJNSE, Olaf
Helmkruid 24
NL-5721 RD Asten / NL
 [2017/46]
Former [2016/52]01 / POORTER, Peter
Postbus 93
NL-4260 Wijken Aalburg / NL
02 / IEDEMA, Jeroen
Azalea straat 19
NL-8471 KA Wolvega / NL
03 / LEIJNSE, Olaf
Helmkruid 24
NL-5721 RD Asten / NL
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2016/52]
Application number, filing date14700036.802.01.2014
[2016/52]
WO2014EP50031
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015101420
Date:09.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3108178
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3108178
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F21K9/00, F21V23/00, F21V19/00, F21V23/02, F21V23/06, // F21Y115/10, F21V29/70
[2017/28]
Former International [2016/52]F21V29/00, F21V19/00, F21K99/00, F21Y101/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LED-FASSUNGSANORDNUNG[2016/52]
English:LED SOCKET ASSEMBLY[2016/52]
French:ENSEMBLE DOUILLE DE DEL[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2016National basic fee paid 
27.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
27.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2017Fee for grant paid
05.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2017
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE02.01.2018
LU02.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE02.01.2018
LU02.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU02.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU02.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU02.01.2018
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013128732  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,18-20 * figures 2-5, 10, 11 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 15 * * page 8, line 38 - page 9, line 28 *;
 [X]WO2011088212  (MOLEX INC [US]; ZADEREJ VICTOR [US]; MCGOWAN DANIEL B [US]; ACHAMMER D) [X] 1-10,18-20 * figures 19-25 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0049] *;
 [A]EP2623854  (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-10,18-20 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0044] *;
 [A]EP2570721  (TYCO ELECTRONICS JAPAN G K [JP]) [A] 1-10,18-20 * figures 3, 4, 5, 9 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] *;
 [XAI]EP2333405  (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 11 * figures 3, 9, 10, 13 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0070] * [A] 12-14 [I] 15-17;
 [A]EP2525447  (TYCO ELECTRONICS JAPAN G K [JP]) [A] 11-17 * figures 4, 5, 7-9 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0039] *;
 [A]EP2333398  (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 11-17 * figures 1, 3, 6, 7, 11-13 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0059] *