Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2941205

EP2941205 - DISTAL RESECTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/46]DISTAL RESECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS
[2016/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2015/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Nolan C.
165 E Deerwood Ct
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / Vandiepenbos, Jeffery A.
17159 CR48
Syracuse, Indiana 46567 / US
03 / May, Justin J.
3865 East Forest Glen Avenue
Leesburg, Indiana 46538 / US
 [2015/46]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/13]
Former [2015/46]Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14701633.107.01.2014
[2015/46]
WO2014US10473
Priority number, dateUS201361749569P07.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361749569 P
[2015/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014107716
Date:10.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2941205
Date:11.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014
[2015/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2941205
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/15, A61B17/17
[2015/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME FÜR DISTALE RESEKTION[2016/40]
English:DISTAL RESECTION SYSTEMS[2016/40]
French:SYSTÈMES DE RÉSECTION DISTALE[2016/40]
Former [2015/46]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DISTALE RESEKTION
Former [2015/46]DISTAL RESECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS
Former [2015/46]SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE RÉSECTION DISTALE
Entry into regional phase06.08.2015National basic fee paid 
06.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/46]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2017Fee for grant paid
20.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006241634  (TUTTLE DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0131] * * figures 10-13B *;
 [A]US5662656  (WHITE STEPHEN E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2006195111  (COUTURE PIERRE [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5720752  (ELLIOTT SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 33-34 *