Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948891

EP2948891 - USER IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDnow GmbH
Fürstenstraße 15
80333 München / DE
[2016/19]
Former [2015/49]For all designated states
IDnow GmbH
Bayerstr. 1
80335 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BAUER, Armin
Unertlstr. 40
80803 München / DE
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date14701683.613.01.2014
[2015/49]
WO2014EP50480
Priority number, dateDE20131010063522.01.2013         Original published format: DE102013100635
[2015/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014114513
Date:31.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948891
Date:02.12.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2948891
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search reportEP31.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/32
[2015/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENUTZER-IDENTIFIKATION[2015/49]
English:USER IDENTIFICATION[2015/49]
French:IDENTIFICATION DE L'UTILISATEUR[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2015National basic fee paid 
24.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
28.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2016Fee for grant paid
24.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16169902.0  / EP3086251
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2016  25.11.2016  ADMISSIBLE
WebID Solutions GmbH
Friedrichstrasse 88
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 02  16.02.2017  21.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Post AG
Charles-de-Gaulle-Straße 20
53113 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/13]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2016  25.11.2016  ADMISSIBLE
WebID Solutions GmbH
Friedrichstrasse 88
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 02  16.02.2017  21.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsche Post AG
Charles-de-Gaulle-Straße 20
53113 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2016/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2016   
WebID Solutions GmbH
Friedrichstrasse 88
10117 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
27.03.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
BE31.01.2017
[2017/47]
Former [2017/37]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
BE31.01.2017
Former [2017/11]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[IP]GB2501362  (BUD ANDREW [GB]) [IP] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  - Anonymous, "ID check system for passport check & ID scanners | IDsmart", (20121116), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20121116001247/http://idscan.co.uk/id-check-idsmart, (20140410), XP055113456 [X] 1,10,11 * page 1 * [I] 2-9,12-14
 [I]  - "Netverify Implementation Guide Contents", (20121218), URL: http://jumio.com/wp-content/uploads/netverify_implementation/Netverify_Implementation_Guide_v1_3_0.pdf, (20140410), XP055113353 [I] 1-14 * page 4 * * page 6 - page 8 *
 [A]  - "PRADOTEC and Intel Announce Intel Atom(TM) Processor-based Handheld ePassport Terminal", (20110818), URL: http://www.pradotec.com.my/webadmin/v2/news_event_hpt6002011.html, (20130607), XP055065794 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
OppositionUS2003139994
 US2005129282
 US2009154813
 US2012143760
 EP2174796
 DE19901881
 DE19906388
 DE102004056007
 EP1152592
 EP2437186
 US2012180115
 US2012106805
 US2007098225
 WO2005008566
    - "Postident- richtig identifizieren", Deutsche Post, (20090800), XP055357030
    - "Damit's in die richtingen Hände kommt.", Deutsche Post, (20030400), XP055357054
    - "Postident", Wikipedia Artikel, (20120928), XP055357066
    - "DKB Cash-Eröffnung", Deutsche Kreditbank AG, (20120308), XP055357085
    - "Gewusst wie: Postident Verfahren", Test.de, (20110118), XP055357096
    - "Ausführung durch Dritte", Dr. Felix Herzog Et Al, Geldwäschegesetz, (20100000), vol. S. II-V, pages 338 - 357, ISBN 9783406581304, XP055357116