blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2948891 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2948891



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1802
27.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.08.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
16.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.05.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
10.05.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
26.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 44
14.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.02.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
14.02.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
14.02.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
01.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.01.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
29.01.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
05.12.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.10.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.10.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.10.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.10.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.10.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
02.10.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
02.10.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
02.10.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
27.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.09.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
20.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.09.2018 Claims Appeal 5
20.09.2018 Claims Appeal 5
20.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.09.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
08.08.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
08.08.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
02.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.08.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 4
02.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.08.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.08.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
25.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
20.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.07.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
05.07.2018 Annex to the communication Opposition 9
05.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.06.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.06.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
23.05.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 27
23.05.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
23.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.05.2018 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 39
23.05.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 25
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
27.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.04.2018 Description Opposition 5
27.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.04.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.04.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.03.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
22.03.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
22.03.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.03.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 6
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Claims Opposition 5
23.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
22.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
21.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
16.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
22.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2017 Summons (notice) Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2017 Summons (notice) Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
25.09.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.09.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.09.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 36
29.06.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
11.05.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
27.03.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.03.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.03.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 2
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 2
08.03.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 5
07.03.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.02.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.02.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
20.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
16.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.02.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.02.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
16.02.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.02.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.11.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.11.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 25
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
24.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.09.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.08.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
19.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.04.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
24.03.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
24.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
24.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
18.03.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 39
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 28
24.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
24.02.2016 Description Search / examination 27
24.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.01.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
28.01.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 16
13.11.2015 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
04.11.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
24.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
24.08.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.08.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
08.06.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
31.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
31.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
31.07.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
13.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
13.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
13.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
13.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
09.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
13.01.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
13.01.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
13.01.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 27
13.01.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6