blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2948891 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP14701683 EP16169902



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3086251Global Dossier 26.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14701683 13.01.2014
DE102013100635 22.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2948891Global Dossier 18.05.2016B1
EP2948891 02.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013100635 22.01.2013
WO2014EP50480 13.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2586144T 11.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
DE102013100635 22.01.2013
WO2014EP50480 13.01.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014114513Global Dossier 31.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013100635 22.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013100635 18.09.2014A8
DE102013100635 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013100635 22.01.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3086251