Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948750

EP2948750 - RT-QPCR ANALYSIS OF MICRO-DISSECTED MATERIAL FROM STAINED FFPET SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BAHLE, Beatrix
Waldstrasse 53
82386 Oberhausen / DE
02 / HEROLD, Andrea
Am Ock 1
82418 Murnau / DE
03 / LOHMANN, Sabine
Primelstrasse 1
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / MOOSMANN, Sabine
Kocheler Strasse 16
83671 Benediktbeuern / DE
05 / SCHUSTER, Julian
Bahnhofstrasse 8
82377 Penzberg / DE
06 / SINGER, Monika
Eibenweg 7
82319 Starnberg / DE
 [2016/48]
Former [2015/49]01 / BAHLE, Beatrix
Waldstrasse 53
82386 Oberhausen / DE
02 / HEROLD, Andrea
Am Ock 1
82418 Murnau / DE
03 / LOHMANN, Sabine
Primelstrasse 1
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / MOOSMANN, Sabine
Kocheler Strasse 16
83671 Benediktbeuern / DE
05 / SCHUSTER, Julian
Dorfstraße 4a
83673 Bichl / DE
06 / SINGER, Monika
Eibenweg 7
82319 Starnberg / DE
Representative(s)Merkel, Patrick
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
[2015/49]
Application number, filing date14702215.622.01.2014
[2015/49]
WO2014EP51157
Priority number, dateEP2013015257924.01.2013         Original published format: EP 13152579
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014114650
Date:31.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948750
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2948750
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/30
[2015/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RT-QPCR-ANALYSE VON MIKROSEZIERTEM MATERIAL AUS GEFÄRBTEM FFPET-ABSCHNITT[2016/24]
English:RT-QPCR ANALYSIS OF MICRO-DISSECTED MATERIAL FROM STAINED FFPET SECTION[2015/49]
French:ANALYSE RT-QPCR DE MATÉRIAU MICRO-DISSÉQUÉ À PARTIR DE SECTION FFPET TEINTÉE[2016/24]
Former [2015/49]RT-QPCR-ANALYSE VON MIKROSEZIERTEM MATERIAL AUS GEFÄRBTEM FFPET-SCHNITT
Former [2015/49]ANALYSE PAR RT-QPCR DE MATÉRIAU MICRO-DISSÉQUÉ D'UNE COUPE DE TFFIP COLORÉE
Entry into regional phase24.08.2015National basic fee paid 
24.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
06.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2016Fee for grant paid
21.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2016
Opposition(s)31.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2014
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
MK30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU22.01.2014
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU22.01.2014
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/31]AT30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV30.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0006780  (AMBION INC [US]; LADER ERIC S [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 12; example 16 *;
 [A]  - J. A. RAMOS-VARA, "Technical Aspects of Immunohistochemistry", VETERINARY PATHOLOGY, (20050701), vol. 42, no. 4, doi:10.1354/vp.42-4-405, ISSN 0300-9858, pages 405 - 426, XP055083524 [A] 1-15 * page 411, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1354/vp.42-4-405
 [A]  - CAM Y ET AL, "IMMUNOLOCALIZATION OF ACIDIC AND BASIC FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTORS DURING MOUSE ODONTOGENESIS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF THE BASQUE COUNTRY PRES, LEIOA, ES, (19920901), vol. 36, no. 3, ISSN 0214-6282, pages 381 - 389, XP002046898 [A] 1-15 * table 2 *
 [A]  - FOLKVORD J M ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF IMMUNOHISTOCHEMICAL TECHNIQUES TO DETECT EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX PROTEINS IN FIXED SKIN SPECIMENS", JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1554, pages 105 - 114, XP002698210 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/37.1.2461979
 [A]  - THEOPHILE KATHARINA ET AL, "Amplification of mRNA from laser-microdissected single or clustered cells in formalin-fixed and paraffin-embedded tissues for application in quantitative real-time PCR", DIAGNOSTIC MOLECULAR PATHOLOGY, (200806), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 1052-9551, pages 101 - 106, XP008162690 [A] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/PDM.0b013e318163f26e
 [A]  - MACABEO-ONG M ET AL, "EFFECT OF DURATION OF FIXATION ON QUANTITATIVE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTION POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION ANALYSES", MODERN PATHOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (20020901), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1097/01.MP.0000026054.62220.FC, ISSN 0893-3952, pages 979 - 987, XP008031983 [A] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.MP.0000026054.62220.FC
 [A]  - GILBERT M T P ET AL, "The isolation of nucleic acids from fixed, paraffin-embedded tissues-which methods are useful when", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20070620), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0000537, ISSN 1932-6203, page e537, XP002547508 [A] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000537
 [A]  - HAISHIMA ATSUKO ET AL, "Detection of Bcl-2 mRNA and its product in the glomerular podocytes of the normal rat kidney", EXPERIMENTAL AND TOXICOLOGIC PATHOLOGY, (201209), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 633 - 637, XP002698144 [A] 1,2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.etp.2010.12.006
by applicant   - LOHMANN ET AL., METHODS, (201301), vol. 59, no. 1
    - BUCKANOVICH ET AL., CANCER BIOL THER., (200606), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 635 - 42
    - GJERDRUM ET AL., DIAGN MOL PATHOL, (2004), pages 224 - 233
    - BROWN ET AL., RNA JOURNAL, (2009), pages 2364 - 2374