Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2943132

EP2943132 - SOFT TISSUE ANCHORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
4Tech Inc.
OXO Capital, LLC
465 Waverley Oaks Road, Suite 420
Waltham, MA 02452-8496 / US
[2017/08]
Former [2015/47]For all designated states
4Tech Inc.
275 Grove Street, Suite 2-400
Newton MA 02466 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TOBIS, Idan
3B Eshkol Street
99789 Beth Hashmonai / IL
02 / GILMORE, Michael
Rathbane
Ardrahan County Galway / IE
03 / MURPHY, Charlotte
Turlough
Ballindive
Ardrahan County Galway / IE
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date14702307.109.01.2014
[2015/47]
WO2014IL50027
Priority number, dateUS201361750427P09.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361750427 P
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014108903
Date:17.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2943132
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2943132
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/064
[2017/50]
Former International [2017/33]A61B17/06, A61N1/05
Former International [2015/47]A61B17/06, A61N1/05, A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WEICHGEWEBEANKER[2015/47]
English:SOFT TISSUE ANCHORS[2015/47]
French:ORGANES D'ANCRAGE DE TISSU MOU[2015/47]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2015National basic fee paid 
24.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
13.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2017/33]
13.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.01.2018Fee for grant paid
18.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
16.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2017
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/26]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1759663  (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0051] - [0055]; figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2009101617  (CORASSIST CARDIOVASCULAR LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * pages 15-17; figure 1h *;
 [X]FR2930137  (COREVALVE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 7; figure 6 *;
 [X]US2006052821  (ABBOTT RYAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0104] - [0106]; figure 6d *;
 [X]US5792400  (TALJA MARTTI [FI], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 9d *;
 [I]EP1836971  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0089]; figure 19 *;
 [I]US2011112619  (FOSTER ARTHUR J [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * figure 13 *;
 [A]US2012215236  (MATSUNAGA REI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 11 *;
 [A]WO2010071494  (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * pages 6-7; figure 1 *
by applicantWO2011089601
 US2011184510
 US2012035712
 US2013325115
 US2013018459
 WO2013011502