Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2944026

EP2944026 - HYBRID AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / RAJAEE, Omid
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/47]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14702373.310.01.2014
[2015/47]
WO2014US11165
Priority number, dateUS20131374001311.01.2013         Original published format: US201313740013
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014110458
Date:17.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2944026
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H03F3/45
[2015/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDVERSTÄRKER[2015/47]
English:HYBRID AMPLIFIER[2015/47]
French:AMPLIFICATEUR HYBRIDE[2015/47]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2015National basic fee paid 
31.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007063409  (SIGE SEMICONDUCTOR EUROP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,7,14,17,19 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051]; figure 7 *;
 [X]US2007229154  (KIM NAMSOO [US], et al) [X] 1,7,14,17,19 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082]; figure 10 *;
 [X]US2012286874  (KIM NAMSOO [US], et al) [X] 1,7,14,17,19 * paragraph [0044]; figure 9B *;
 [X]US2003006842  (TURUDIC ANDY [US], et al) [X] 1,14,17,19 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *;
 [XI]WO02091569  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 14,17-19 * page 6, line 23 - page 9, line 5; figures 3,4 * [I] 1,2,7,8,10,11;
 [XI]US6373337  (GANSER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 14,17-19 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 * [I] 1,2,7-11;
 [XI]  - TRAN H ET AL, "6-KOMEGA 43-GB/S DIFFERENTIAL TRANSIMPEDANCE-LIMITING AMPLIFIER WITH AUTO-ZERO FEEDBACK AND HIGH DYNAMIC RANGE", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041001), vol. 39, no. 10, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2004.833547, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1680 - 1689, XP001224779 [X] 14,17-19 * Section C. Limiting Amplifier and Output Stage;; figure 8 * [I] 1,2,7,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2004.833547
 [XI]  - ITALIA A ET AL, "A variable-gain image-reject down-converter for 5-6 GHz WLAN applications", RADIO FREQUENCY INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (RFIC) SYMPOSIUM, 2004. DIGEST OF PAPERS. 2004 IEEE FORT WORTH, TX, USA JUNE 6-8, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040606), doi:10.1109/RFIC.2004.1320554, ISBN 978-0-7803-8333-3, pages 149 - 152, XP010713754 [X] 14,17,19 * Section A. Variable-gain low noise amplifier;; figure 2 * [I] 1,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RFIC.2004.1320554
 [A]  - KUSH GULATI ET AL, "A High-Swing CMOS Telescopic Operational Amplifier", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19981201), vol. 33, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9200, XP011060888 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *