Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2950634

EP2950634 - SOLANUM LYCOPERSICUM PLANTS HAVING PINK FRUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.07.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nunhems B.V.
Napoleonsweg 152
6083 AB Nunhem / NL
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / VRIEZEN, Hendrik, Willem
De Keverbergstraat 54
NL-6081 BM Haelen / NL
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date14702508.428.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014EP51582
Priority number, dateEP2013015346131.01.2013         Original published format: EP 13153461
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014118150
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2950634
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/08, A01H1/04
[2015/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
TitleGerman:SOLANUM LYCOPERSICUM-PFLANZEN MIT PINKFARBENEN FRÜCHTEN[2018/18]
English:SOLANUM LYCOPERSICUM PLANTS HAVING PINK FRUITS[2015/50]
French:PLANTES DE SOLANUM LYCOPERSICUM À FRUITS ROSE[2018/18]
Former [2015/50]SOLANUM-LYCOPERSICUM-PFLANZEN MIT PINKFARBENEN FRÜCHTEN
Former [2015/50]PLANTES SOLANUM LYCOPERSICUM PRÉSENTANT DES FRUITS ROSES
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase31.08.2015National basic fee paid 
31.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
10.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2796/18
02.11.2018Statement of grounds filed
30.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2009157000  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 5 - line 9 * * page 14, line 28 - line 32; example 7; claim - *;
 [Y]  - AVITAL ADATO ET AL, "Fruit-Surface Flavonoid Accumulation in Tomato Is Controlled by a SlMYB12-Regulated Transcriptional Network", PLOS GENETICS, (20091218), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pgen.1000777, page e1000777, XP055066453 [Y] 1-12 * page 15, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 18, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 2; figure - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1000777
 [A]  - LUO JIE ET AL, "AtMYB12 regulates caffeoyl quinic acid and flavonol synthesis in tomato: expression in fruit results in very high levels of both types of polyphenol", THE PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 56, no. 2, doi:10.1111/J.1365-313X.2008.03597.X, ISSN 0960-7412, (20081001), pages 316 - 326, (20080704), XP002548111 [A] 1-12 * page 319, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 322, column 1, paragraph 1; figure - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-313X.2008.03597.X
 [A]  - MEHRTENS FRANK ET AL, "The Arabidopsis transcription factor MYB12 is a flavonol-specific regulator of phenylpropanoid biosynthesis", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (20050601), vol. 138, no. 2, doi:10.1104/PP.104.058032, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1083 - 1096, XP002420088 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.104.058032
by applicantEP1963505
    - E.W. LINDSTROM, INHERITANCE IN TOMATOES, GENETICS, (1925), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 305 - 317
    - LINDSTROM, INHERITANCE IN TOMATOES, GENETICS, (1925), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 305 - 317
    - LEWINSOHN ET AL., TRENDS FOOD SCI TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 16, pages 407 - 415
    - BALLESTER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 152, pages 71 - 84
    - BALLESTER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 152, page 77
    - ADATO ET AL., PLOS GENETICS, (2009), vol. 5, no. 12, page E1000777
    - BONI ET AL., NEW PHYTOLOGIST, (2005), vol. 166, pages 427 - 438
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919
    - SACKS; FRANCIS, J. AMER. SOC. HORT. SCI., (2001), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 221 - 226
    - HENIKOFF ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 135, pages 630 - 636
    - TILL ET AL., BMC PLANT BIOL, (2007), vol. 7, page 19
    - TILL ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL, (2006), vol. 323, pages 127 - 35
    - TILL ET AL., BMC PLANT BIOL, (2004), vol. 4, page 12
    - TILL ET AL., NAT PROTOC, (2006), vol. 1, pages 2465 - 77
    - COMAI ET AL., PLANT J, (2004), vol. 37, pages 778 - 86
    - RIGOLA ET AL., PLOS ONE, (200903), vol. 4, no. 3, page E4761
    - MUTSCHLER ET AL., HORTSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 27, pages 352 - 355
    - MARTINEZ ET AL., ACTA HORTICULTURAE, (1995), vol. 412, pages 463 - 469
    - BUI ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD PROPERTIES, (2010), vol. 13, no. 4, page 830 846
    - LIU ET AL., PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 1, pages 195 - 207
    - FISH ET AL., J. FOOD COMPOS. ANAL., (2002), vol. 15, pages 309 - 317
    - CLEMENT, J. 4GRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2008), vol. 56, pages 9813 - 9818
    - SLIMESTAD ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2008), vol. 56, pages 2436 - 2441
    - BOVY ET AL., THE PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 2509 - 2526
    - KRIEG, GENETICS, (1963), vol. 48, pages 561 - 580