Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2950833

EP2950833 - FUNCTIONALLY-CLOSED, STERILE BLOOD PROCESSING SOLUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAY, Alan
44 Tower Hill Road
North Reading, Massachusetts 01864 / US
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14702699.114.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014US11451
Priority number, dateUS20131375671201.02.2013         Original published format: US201313756712
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014120431
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2950833
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02
[2015/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONELL GESCHLOSSENES STERILES BLUTVERARBEITUNGSLÖSUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2015/50]
English:FUNCTIONALLY-CLOSED, STERILE BLOOD PROCESSING SOLUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/50]
French:SYSTÈME DE SOLUTION DE TRAITEMENT SANGUIN STÉRILE, FONCTIONNELLEMENT FERMÉ ET PROCÉDÉ[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2015National basic fee paid 
19.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
14.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[IA]EP0987034  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0110] - [0120]; figure 1 * [A] 16-29;
 [A]US4116646  (EDWARDS JAMES H) [A] 1-29 * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 10; figure 5 *